Financial history THRUMPTON KIDS CLUBS

Charity number: 1023412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £119.76k £121.32k £103.75k £75.52k £118.33k
Total expenditure £114.86k £124.55k £106.40k £97.94k £115.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A