Financial history UNISON WELFARE

Charity number: 1023552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.34m £1.50m £1.47m £2.11m £2.26m
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.23m £1.36m £1.76m £2.03m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £944.00k £1.11m £1.05m £1.76m £1.88m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £114.73k £116.69k £124.95k
Income - Charitable activities £125.98k £34.32k £7.66k £2.84k £1.80k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £265.62k £245.01k £267.63k £234.22k £253.89k
Income - Other £1.00k £102.64k £21.20k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £115.50k £12.92k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.15m £1.31m £1.67m £1.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £99.47k £88.04k £49.92k £91.29k £94.52k
Expenditure - Governance £29.25k £23.37k £32.92k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £41.03k £41.20k £43.17k £40.96k £43.76k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0