Trustees UNISON WELFARE

Charity number: 1023552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tony Wright Chair 14 July 2021
BARNSLEY CIVIC ENTERPRISE LTD.
Received: On time
Donald Taylor Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Mandy Buckley Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Theresa Rollinson Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Julia Mwaluke Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Alison Dingle Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Maxine Warrican Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
DEBORAH POTTER Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
DAVID PAGE Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Karen Poole Trustee 21 June 2016
None on record
MARGARET McKEE Trustee 15 June 2016
None on record