Financial history FELLISCLIFFE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1023603
Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 05/05/2020 05/05/2021 05/05/2022
Total gross income £9.08k £4.57k £9.24k £73 £11.41k
Total expenditure £5.54k £6.59k £7.37k £2.98k £6.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A