AFRO CARIBBEAN ELDERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time Download