AFRO CARIBBEAN ELDERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.37k £26.74k £29.29k £40.42k £1.00k
Total expenditure £24.71k £27.82k £33.43k £29.74k £1.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A