DISABLEMENT ASSOCIATION OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM

Charity number: 1023730
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.09m £2.98m £2.96m £2.85m £2.98m
Total expenditure £3.15m £3.00m £3.20m £2.84m £2.97m
Income from government contracts £1.07m £251.09k £876.24k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £252.44k £264.57k £0 £20.80k £2.38k
Income - Other trading activities £69.83k £74.36k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.77m £2.64m £2.94m £2.74m £2.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £198 £13 £0 £78 £0
Income - Other £1.01k £5.20k £0 £10.61k £58.98k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.51m £2.28m £3.20m £2.84m £2.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.55k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £711.36k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £576.67k £13.78k £0 £0 £0