REACT - STEVENAGE AND NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE ORGANISATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
React was registered as a Charity in 1993. Our activities includes assisting clients to fill in DDA/AA forms; helps with appeals and tribunals We advise and give information to Disabled people. React have accessible minibus to provide transport services to disable people. We also provide Awareness training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 July 1993: Standard registration
- 03 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- REACT (Working name)
- REACT DISABILITY GROUP (Working name)
- HERTFORDSHIRE COALITION OF DISABLED PEOPLE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.31k | £38.98k | £41.44k | £55.60k | £34.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.56k | £37.57k | £44.34k | £38.37k | £48.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIEF OF ALL DISABLED PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON MATTERS AFFECTING THEIR DISABILITY
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window