KINGS CAPLE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023846
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 March 2021 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 September 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 02 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required