KINGS CAPLE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1023846
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £2.91k £2.40k £2.40k £1.54k £1.94k
Total expenditure £2.01k £439 £773 £656 £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A