Trustees ELTHAM CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1023904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Quirk B.Ed. M.A. | Chair | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Sterling | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH NUNNS | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Terence Norman Barcock B.SC. MBA | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Nicolas Nunns MA | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Margaret Watson | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James McGechie MScAdv HCP | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jean Homan MBE | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Brining BA MA Ph.D | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LEONARD NORTH F.C.I.L.Ex | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.