ENCORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
work in amateur theatre THE CONSORTIUM IS A GROUP OF 4 MAJOR COMPANIES WHO PERFORM IN COVENTRY. THE CONSORTIUM ASKS AS A LINK BETWEEN THE GROUPS AND ACTS AS A LIASON TO REPRESENT THOSE GROUPS IN ANY PUBLIC FORUM OR DISCUSSION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 July 1993: Standard registration
- THE CONSORTIUM (Working name)
- COVENTRY MUSICAL THEATRE CONSORTIUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL HOWES | Chair | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN LOUISE ELIZABETH O'DONNELL | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/07/1993 AS AMENDED ON 03/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ARTISTIC AND AESTHETIC EDUCATION AND THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA, LITERATURE, OPERA, MIME, MUSIC AND DANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
491 Woodway Lane
COVENTRY
CV2 2AG
- Phone:
- 07790320513
- Email:
- helenodonnell66@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window