Financial history FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST PAUL'S CRANFIELD

Charity number: 1023935
Charity reporting is overdue by 531 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.00k £7.17k £4.83k £787 £1.49k
Total expenditure £14.21k £733 £10.74k £1.19k £652
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A