GREAT BARTON CE PRIMARY ACADEMY PTFA

Charity number: 1024054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.08k £13.63k £13.12k £8.92k £4.63k
Total expenditure £21.06k £8.22k £13.75k £10.48k £9.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A