GREAT BARTON CE PRIMARY ACADEMY PTFA

Charity number: 1024054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NATASHA JANE MORGAN Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
CAROLINE MICHELLE HODGE Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH HORN Trustee 30 September 2014 None on record
Hayley Virciglio Chair 16 September 2019 None on record
CLAIRE LOUISE RATLEY Trustee 25 September 2017 None on record
Clare Louise Ibbotson Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
ADELE RHONA GILMOUR Trustee 26 September 2016 None on record
CATHY FORDHAM Trustee 24 September 2015 None on record