HORN OF AFRICA REFUGEE WELFARE GROUP

Charity number: 1024194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.75k £21.23k £19.93k £23.02k £12.92k
Total expenditure £23.79k £24.55k £23.71k £19.11k £14.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.00k N/A N/A N/A