WHISTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1024306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 May 2018 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 May 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required