Accounts and annual returns DAVIDSON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1024409
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 November 2022 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 September 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 January 2020 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required