Financial history DAVIDSON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1024409
Charity reporting is overdue by 361 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £4.69k £5.69k £5.12k £2.91k £209
Total expenditure £0 £5.20k £4.37k £1.06k £524
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A