Docking Pre-School

Charity number: 1024501
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 October 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 October 2020 118 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 January 2020 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 January 2020 205 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 October 2018 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2018 101 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 October 2018 466 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2018 466 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 08 May 2018 677 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 08 May 2018 677 days late Download