Answers In Genesis UK/Europe

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing speakers for meetings, seminars, training events and conferences. Distributing books, video and audio tapes, DVDs, CD-ROMs and leaflets. Distributing a quarterly Answers magazine of general interest to the average reader. Distributing the Answers Insider quarterly and prayer letters via email and ordinary mail.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Italy
- Northern Ireland
- Russia
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 August 1993: Standard registration
- ANSWERS IN GENESIS (Working name)
- CREATION SCIENCE FOUNDATION (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Iles | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Eagleson Campbell | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stuart Burgess | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr R Beckett | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANDY MCINTOSH | Trustee | 26 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH ALFRED HAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.57k | £255.30k | £299.30k | £237.65k | £329.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.94k | £247.86k | £262.05k | £265.83k | £268.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JULY 1993 as amended on 07 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO PREACH AND OTHERWISE PROCLAIM WHEREVER POSSIBLE AND BY ALL AVAILABLE MEANS THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST; LIKEWISE TO HELP AND ENCOURAGE MEN, WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN THE STUDY OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AS CONTAINED IN THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
16 Morris Road
LEICESTER
LE2 6BR
- Phone:
- 01162708400
- Email:
- ukinfo@answersingenesis.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window