YOUNG FELLOWS ASSOCIATION OF PAKISTAN(Y F A P )UK

Charity number: 1024619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 September 2020 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 July 2019 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 July 2018 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 October 2017 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required