RARE CHROMOSOME DISORDER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1024624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required