WILSDEN VILLAGE NURSERY SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wilsden Village Nursery School is an Ofsted registered provider delivering pre-school education for children from age 2 to 5 following the statutory requirements of the Early Years Foundation Stage which sets the standards that all Early Years providers must meet to ensure children learn and develop well. We work in partnership with parents to enable them to support their child's learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 16 August 1993: Standard registration
- 06 June 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHILDSPLAY (WILSDEN) (Previous name)
- WILSDEN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- WILSDEN PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.81k | £103.86k | £93.30k | £112.80k | £67.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.62k | £105.37k | £85.30k | £102.18k | £103.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £96.96k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEPTEMBER 1994 AND 6 JANUARY 1998 AND 20 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window