Financial history INTERNATIONAL FUND FOR ANIMAL WELFARE (IFAW)

Charity number: 1024806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £18.72m £16.90m £16.65m £18.14m £18.43m
Total expenditure £19.09m £19.65m £16.36m £14.15m £15.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.54m £16.70m £16.50m £18.00m £18.28m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.07k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £174.13k £191.57k £154.52k £136.99k £146.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £7.11m £6.62m £6.59m £8.06m £8.45m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.60m £16.45m £13.13m £11.26m £12.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.49m £3.20m £3.23m £2.89m £3.02m
Expenditure - Governance £149.14k £145.80k £136.18k £131.07k £90.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.22m £8.86m £5.98m £5.03m £5.44m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0