ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CORNWALL BRANCH

Charity number: 1024808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £558.43k £793.33k £954.31k £835.79k £559.72k
Total expenditure £699.54k £690.54k £695.04k £735.04k £794.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £31.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £286.28k £518.07k £709.45k £605.55k £423.69k
Income - Other trading activities £132.17k £135.23k £124.19k £114.99k £35.68k
Income - Charitable activities £52.76k £52.00k £30.55k £22.53k £29.18k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.53k
Income - Investment £87.22k £88.03k £90.12k £92.71k £52.63k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £237.72k £462.31k £651.06k £516.35k £287.04k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £637.75k £633.15k £638.01k £678.07k £714.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.79k £57.20k £56.59k £55.95k £44.94k
Expenditure - Governance £4.34k £4.27k £4.68k £4.77k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.34k £19.93k £21.10k £22.44k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £186 £441 £1.03k £35.06k