Financial history SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1024869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £198.16k £211.68k £209.76k £176.28k £228.26k
Total expenditure £142.15k £187.36k £140.08k £204.34k £173.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A