ARCH INITIATIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARCH Initiatives exists to provide services for people whose lives have been affected by substance misuse. The objective of service provision is to determine a clear pathway for each individual client, away from dependence on drug or alcohol use, and to support and guide the service user along that pathway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 August 1993: Standard registration
- ARCH (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Annie Procter | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Mark Quentin Knight | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Leo Antebi | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.89m | £101.27k | £59.00k | £60.87k | £75.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94m | £124.14k | £135.60k | £53.78k | £42.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.28m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £191.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £192.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £83.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.28m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £266.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £67.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.87m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £19.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS AFFECTED BY ADDICTION TO DRUGS OF ANY KIND AND/OR ALCOHOL ABUSE AND/OR SUBSTANCE MISUSE; TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTANCE MISUSE, REHABILITATION FOLLOWING SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS FOR THOSE WHO HAVE PARTICULAR NEEDS FOR SUCH SKILLS SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT, GUIDANCE AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT, FOR THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED AND IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Resolven House
St Mellons Business Park
Fortran Road
St Mellons
CF3 0EY
- Phone:
- 01633811950
- Email:
- info@archfutures.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window