ROTARY CLUB OF SUTTON IN ASHFIELD WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1025054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 12 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 17 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required