ROTARY CLUB OF SUTTON IN ASHFIELD WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1025054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £16.27k £20.66k £22.27k £18.68k £28.66k
Total expenditure £17.27k £18.86k £21.50k £16.45k £17.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A