SNIBSTON AND DESFORD COLLIERY BANDS COMPRISING THE SNIBSTON AND DESFORD COLLIERY BAND, THE DESFORD COLLIERY BAND AND THE DESFORD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1025068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.45k £80.13k £112.98k £135.38k £104.45k
Total expenditure £88.69k £83.13k £112.50k £131.30k £96.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.00k