Accounts and annual returns BLACKHEATH JAMIA MOSQUE TRUST

Charity number: 1025081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 22 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 22 March 2022 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 22 March 2022 203 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 October 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 30 October 2020 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 13 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 27 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 13 May 2019 255 days late Download Open in new window