Accounts and annual returns EXBOURNE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 April 2025 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 April 2025 664 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 24 April 2025 664 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 April 2025 1007 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 02 April 2025 1007 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window