Financial history EXBOURNE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025126
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £24.73k £43.64k £36.74k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £20.69k £42.06k £35.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A