Accounts and annual returns HADLEIGH AFTERNOON WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1025194

Charity reporting is overdue by 1594 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 865 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 865 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1230 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1230 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1594 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1594 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window