Accounts and annual returns LLANDRINDOD WELLS HOLIDAY PLAYSCHEME

Charity number: 1025247
Charity reporting is overdue by 1812 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1081 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1081 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1446 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1446 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1812 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1812 days