Trustees WILTSHIRE SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1025277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUSTIN PURKIS Chair 14 September 2016
WILTSHIRE NORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Thomas Peter Roberts Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Richard John Skerrett Holmes Trustee 15 July 2021
WALLSCOURT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Thomas John Dobson Trustee 14 July 2020
1ST HIGHWORTH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Paul Ingram Trustee 14 July 2020
None on record
Daniel Bavister Trustee 14 July 2020
None on record
Mollie Nevill Trustee 14 July 2020
None on record
SUZANNE JOAN ROSE Trustee 05 July 2016
THE KILVERT SOCIETY
Received: On time
Stephen Maurice Barley Trustee 05 July 2016
None on record
David Leonard Waspe Trustee 05 July 2016
SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Overdue by 29 days
ROGER FREDERICK REEVES Trustee
None on record