Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025285
Charity reporting is overdue by 971 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 241 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2020 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required