Financial history FRIENDS OF OAKDALE JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025285
Charity reporting is overdue by 977 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £8.80k £8.81k £8.81k £5.21k £2.79k
Total expenditure £7.44k £7.44k £7.65k £8.17k £3.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A