Financial history WICKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1025460
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £6.33k £1.68k £1.68k £4.33k £2.68k
Total expenditure £3.51k £2.11k £2.52k £3.35k £3.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A