Accounts and annual returns GREATER LONDON NORTH EAST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1025705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window