ETWALL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Affiliated with ACWW worldwide, addressing resolutions & mandates, help with the Community and environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 15 September 1993: Standard registration
- ETWALL W I (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Gotch | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Adams | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Moore | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dearden | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Anne Gardam | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSA HILL | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE TASKER | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN HUNTER | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA BATHER | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA LESLEY GAMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS BET COLCLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £3.79k | £2.05k | £1.64k | £111 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32k | £3.73k | £2.01k | £953 | £903 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 OAKLANDS ROAD
ETWALL
DERBY
DE65 6JD
- Phone:
- 01283 734233
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window