PONTYCLUN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The WI provides a service to the community. All women can join. It campaigns on issues which will benefit the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £2,490
Total expenditure: £2,856

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oenwen Ballinger Chair 08 May 2018
None on record
Jeanie Heavisides Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
Carolyn Butcher Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
Arlene King Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
SYLVIA MARGARET COLE Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
LAURA EVANS Trustee 12 February 2012
None on record
MARGARET MORRIS Trustee 12 February 2012
None on record
ANNE SANDRA CORP Trustee
None on record
JOYCE DUNN Trustee
None on record
BRENDA DEVINE Trustee
None on record
JANICE WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.46k £2.04k £6.40k £2.44k £2.49k
Total expenditure £4.02k £1.10k £7.18k £2.59k £2.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLAMORGAN FWI
13 COURTLAND PLACE
PORT TALBOT
SA13 1JJ
Phone:
01639881588
Website:

No information available