Financial history WESTMINSTER ARTS

Charity number: 1025755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £82.72k £96.65k £104.06k £85.64k £172.01k
Total expenditure £81.57k £93.27k £102.06k £100.55k £66.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £62.80k £58.21k £53.35k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A