TOADHALL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £126.93k £107.86k £121.45k £61.97k £110.04k
Total expenditure £108.23k £108.57k £112.89k £67.96k £106.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £104.90k £0 N/A £45.64k £93.22k