Financial history LEWISHAM EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1025785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.25k £1.26k £1.26k £1.31k £1.45k
Total expenditure £761 £1.80k £896 £789 £1.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A