DRESDEN TRUST

Charity number: 1025905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £18.68k £9.18k £13.36k £2.37k £935
Total expenditure £3.13k £27.27k £7.06k £2.71k £785
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A