DRESDEN TRUST

Charity number: 1025905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruediger Goerner Trustee 13 July 2018 None on record
Daniel Schieferdecker Trustee 12 October 2018 None on record
MONICA PETZAL Trustee 07 March 2014
MUSEUM OF WOMEN'S ART Received: On time
Sinclair Mckay Trustee 10 July 2020 None on record
Paul Stocker Trustee 30 June 2017
THE BRITISH-GERMAN ASSOCIATION Received: 9 days late
Marcus Ferrar Trustee 17 May 2013
THE FRIENDS OF SUMMERTOWN LIBRARY Received: On time
Angela Mary Findlay Trustee 04 April 2019 None on record