EACH COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT

Charity number: 1025967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.40m £803.69k £874.76k £1.18m £1.18m
Total expenditure £1.37m £947.72k £1.03m £1.30m £1.26m
Income from government contracts £1.12m £421.14k £424.01k £771.89k £787.70k
Income from government grants £156.64k £293.96k £122.21k £120.49k £163.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £276.35k £310.75k £4.96k £388.68k £374.04k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £25.55k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.12m £421.14k £838.13k £786.35k £787.70k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.90k £3.86k £4.73k £1.42k £1.98k
Income - Other £61 £67.94k £1.40k £0 £18.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.37m £940.27k £1.03m £1.30m £1.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.41k £7.45k £7.46k £7.82k £7.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0