POCHIN SCHOOL BARKBY PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £9.03k £8.97k £10.41k £7.34k £11.86k
Total expenditure £16.06k £9.36k £11.15k £5.45k £13.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £500